HOOKE COURT IN MALAWI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity works in a rural area of northern Malawi supporting 9 primary schools in the Bandawe zone. Volunteers spend two weeks every summer working with children and teachers to help improve education. Trustees raise money to provide educational resources for all the schools on annual basis. trustees visit the area at regular intervals to check on progress and use of resources.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Malawi
Governance
- 13 May 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN VIAN | Chair | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
christopher McConnell | Trustee | 29 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PETER COOPER | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Felicity Brugge | Trustee | 05 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Marilyn Leah | Trustee | 04 December 2017 |
|
|
||||
Daphne Belcher | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD MCNEAL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SARAH MCCONNELL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
FIONA BOGGIS | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUSANNA MCNEALL | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
CAROLINE Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.94k | £16.17k | £15.34k | £23.47k | £32.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.11k | £18.66k | £20.11k | £20.04k | £44.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 10 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 25 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 02 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED ON 27 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY: IMPROVING PRIMARY EDUCATION PRACTICE IN RURAL AREAS OF AFRICA PROVIDING CHILDREN IN THESE AREAS WITH OPPORTUNITIES TO ENGAGE IN LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES INSIDE AND OUTSIDE THE CLASSROOM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hooke Court
Hooke
Beaminster
DT8 3NX
- Phone:
- 01308862260
- Email:
- sarah@hookecourt.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window