FRIENDS OF JUDITH KERR PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of Judith Kerr Primary School is a volunteer organisation which exists to advance the education of the pupils in the Judith Kerr Primary school by: Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school, Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support the school and advance the education of the pupils
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southwark
Governance
- 24 June 2016: Standard registration
- FOJKPS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Wren | Chair | 28 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anna Marie Geldart | Trustee | 30 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Glenville Pick | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paula Rocktaeschel | Trustee | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Stanley Lines | Trustee | 17 January 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.90k | £22.84k | £40.78k | £8.44k | £59.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £33.08k | £11.34k | £38.59k | £19.56k | £39.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 18 June 2024 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 July 2022 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2022 | 611 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 04 July 2022 | 611 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MAR 2016 as amended on 03 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
68 Half Moon Lane
LONDON
SE24 9JE
- Phone:
- 07958684193
- Email:
- fojkps@gmail.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window