COSBY COMMUNITY LIBRARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide by any legal means a public library service to the parish of Cosby and the surrounding area. In providing this service we intend to enhance the education and wellbeing of the community by supporting social and educational activities through in-house and bought in services . The library will also be a source for the dissemination of local information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £400 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 July 2016: CIO registration
- CCL (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Terry Crossley | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Joan Clarke | Trustee | 09 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Lapidge | Trustee | 05 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.97k | £15.09k | £9.06k | £34.81k | £7.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.26k | £3.50k | £10.20k | £21.96k | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £4.25k | £4.35k | £400 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 21 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
(1)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN COSBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF A LENDING LIBRARY. (2)TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF COSBY AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Ashtree Road
Cosby
LEICESTER
LE9 1UA
- Phone:
- 07789756771
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window