WOMEN OF WORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Women of Worth is a women's only community project providing specialist needs-led support services for women who are vulnerable, have multiple complex needs and who are often isolated and excluded from society because of their life style circumstances.We are based in an deprived area with socio-economic status is low and most of the families are on benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £76,847 from 3 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
Governance
- 01 November 2016: CIO registration
- WOW (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HELLEN PERRY | Chair | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Pat Roberts | Trustee | 29 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tegan Waugh | Trustee | 31 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Natasha Golombeck | Trustee | 15 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gieselle Williams | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAWN GIAMAS MBE | Trustee | 01 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.61k | £108.31k | £99.38k | £128.33k | £131.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.29k | £84.73k | £106.35k | £121.23k | £110.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £35.75k | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.86k | £42.58k | £92.60k | £93.27k | £76.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION Registered 01 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF WOMEN AND THEIR CHILDREN WHO ARE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND ANY ACTIVITIES OR SERVICES DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THOSE NEEDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5-7 New Road
Radcliffe
MANCHESTER
M26 1LS
- Phone:
- 07398755189
- Email:
- dawng@womenofworth.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window