DINAS POWYS LIBRARY AND ACTIVITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main activity of the charity is to maintain and operate the library for the residents of Dinas Powys. It is staffed by volunteers supported by a part-time librarian funded by the Vale of Glamorgan Council. As well as the provision of books, large print and audio, we offer computer access, dvds, photocopying, children's activities and a range of fund raising events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £622 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 06 September 2016: CIO registration
- DPL&AC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS FRANKS | Chair | 05 October 2016 |
|
|||||
KEITH HATTON | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|||||
MARIANNE COWPE | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MARY KATHLEEN TEMPLING | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLARE RICHARDSON | Trustee | 05 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.32k | £17.62k | £16.85k | £32.23k | £35.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.70k | £10.85k | £16.75k | £22.91k | £29.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £106.34k | £12.03k | £4.33k | £2.82k | £622 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 06 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN DINAS POWYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA BY OPERATING AND MANAGING A LENDING LIBRARY. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF DINAS POWYS AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 MILLBROOK HEIGHTS
DINAS POWYS
CF64 4JJ
- Phone:
- 07749825751
- Email:
- info@dinaspowyslibrary.wales
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window