SOUTH CRAVEN COMMUNITY LIBRARY SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Library services ,including training of information technology, children's activities encouraging them to read
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,822 from 4 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CANON MICHAEL COWGILL | Chair | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ann Wood | Trustee | 20 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Boyd | Trustee | 17 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Polshaw | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Karen Taylor | Trustee | 29 November 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.22k | £11.11k | £2.26k | £6.52k | £11.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.42k | £4.75k | £6.42k | £9.65k | £9.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.62k | £10.00k | N/A | £3.23k | £7.82k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 15 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN CROSS HILLS SERVING AN AREA GENERALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DEFINED AS ‘SOUTH CRAVEN’;- 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION BY THE PROVISION OF A COMMUNITY LENDING LIBRARY; AND 2) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
IN CROSS HILLS SERVING AN AREA GENERALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY DEFINED AS ‘SOUTH CRAVEN’
Contact information
- Address:
-
South Craven Community Library
Main Street
Cross Hills
KEIGHLEY
West Yorkshire
BD20 8TQ
- Phone:
- 01609534502
- Email:
- Enquiries@sccls.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window