THE GUIDE ASSOCIATION NORTH YORKSHIRE NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WEEKLY MEETINGS,OUTDOOR ACTIVITIES SUCH AS CAMPING, CANOEING. TRAINING IN CITIZENSHIP AND LEADERSHIP.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £5,200 from 3 government grant(s)
People

15 Trustee(s)
362 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 07 July 1978: Standard registration
- GIRL GUIDING NORTH YORKSHIRE NORTH EAST (Working name)
- THE NORTH YORKSHIRE NORTH EAST COUNTY UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gemma Amanda Darlow-Castleton | Trustee | 23 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise Barker | Trustee | 07 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Walker | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Rebbecca Helen Stuart | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Jane Clarkson | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Elizabeth Forbes | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Hume | Trustee | 26 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dickinson | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Elizabeth Quince | Trustee | 11 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Burniston | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stacey Dianne Stockdale | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Charlotte Sawyer | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacquelyn Ann Ahearn | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amelia Forrest | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
JANE GILBY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.12k | £18.18k | £28.23k | £49.92k | £85.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.75k | £32.03k | £31.56k | £57.61k | £76.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.20k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 09 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14 DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
NORTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HILLCREST
SLEEGILL
RICHMOND
DL10 4RH
- Phone:
- 01748823241
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window