WITNEY WOLVES RUGBY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SEN tag rugby team
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 14 March 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Beecher | Trustee | 06 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Edmonds | Trustee | 10 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Alexander Lee | Trustee | 30 March 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53k | £4.43k | £2.38k | £2.07k | £6.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £876 | £92 | £4.39k | £0 | £2.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 14 Mar 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF TAG RUGBY, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF BEING CHILDREN OVER 7 WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Witney Rugby Football Club Ltd
Hailey
WITNEY
OX29 9UH
- Phone:
- 01993771043
- Email:
- dje3141@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window