FRIENDS OF CANARY WHARF COLLEGE EAST FERRY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing effective relationships between the staff, parents and others associated with the school, including creating social opportunities to strengthen the Canary Wharf College community. Engaging in activities which support the school and advance the education of the pupils attending it.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 30 March 2016: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Upasna Bhadhal | Chair | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Julie Coackley | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Louise Sanders | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Marie Bennett | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Andrews | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Bartlett | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.47k | £17.39k | £9.65k | £52.61k | £59.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.40k | £19.42k | £14.76k | £53.14k | £40.85k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 26 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 27 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 September 2021 | 392 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 September 2021 | 392 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 FEB 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE FRIENDS ASSOCIATION IS TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR BY: DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL, INCLUDING CREATING SOCIAL OPPORTUNITIES TO STRENGTHEN THE CANARY WHARF COLLEGE COMMUNITY; ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT; PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL; AND OTHERWISE PROVIDING SUPPORT FOR THE SCHOOL IN WAYS IDENTIFIED BY THE COMMITTEE IN CONSULTATION WITH THE HEAD TEACHER OF THE SCHOOL (THE HEAD) AND THE EXECUTIVE PRINCIPAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Canary Wharf College
197 East Ferry Road
LONDON
E14 3BA
- Phone:
- 07711914696
- Email:
- eastferryfriends@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window