Accounts and annual returns CHELLASTON INFANTS PARENTS, TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1166156
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 13 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 13 March 2025 256 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 29 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 30 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 February 2021 19 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required