Accounts and annual returns CREUNANT PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1168543
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 12 February 2025 378 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 February 2025 743 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 12 February 2025 1108 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 June 2021 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required