U3A DEREHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
U3A Dereham provides a framework to allow people of similar interests to meet together in groups; to organise how when and where they would like to meet; what why and where they will be doing it. It is for the benefit of third-agers (generally the retired). Membership subscription enables monthly meetings for all members in a warm comfortable environment with good speakers, time for socialising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
524 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 September 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Pauline Lowe | Chair | 05 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Norma Joan Haynes | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Louise Wilson | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Eileen Freebairn | Trustee | 01 May 2025 |
|
|
||||
Debra Jane Hubbard | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Fielder | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trudy Gust | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Angela Stannard | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Mary Atterwell | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Denise Wicks | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.42k | £1.99k | £9.90k | £2.85k | £11.84k | |
|
Total expenditure | £29.58k | £3.75k | £7.81k | £8.37k | £9.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 May 2024 | 94 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 MAY 2012 AS AMENDED ON 09 APR 2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE U3A ARE: (I) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE NO LONGER IN FULL TIME GAINFUL EMPLOYMENT IN DEREHAM AND ITS SURROUNDING LOCALITY . (II) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR LEISURE TIME AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE ABOVE PERSONS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Snowberry House
Syers Lane
Beeston
KING'S LYNN
Norfolk
PE32 2NJ
- Phone:
- 07872896109
- Email:
- paulinelowe@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window