PARENTS IN NEED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aim of the charity is to finance specialist reports to enable children with special educational needs to access an appropriate education. Independent reports provide the parent with the necessary evidence required by the local authority before a placement is agreed. We listen to parents of children with Special Needs and provide a service to those who do not have the means to pay for this.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Merton
Governance
- 26 September 2016: Standard registration
- PIN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CATHERINE BAILEY | Chair | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Marion Strudwick | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Chatwin | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Robina Gillian Slingsby | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA BURGESS | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE OWEN | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIA PRITCHETT | Trustee | 16 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.94k | £107.19k | £19.60k | £21.19k | £19.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.49k | £58.73k | £26.92k | £42.76k | £50.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 24 November 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 APR 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ('THE OBJECTS'?) ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE 25 WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE TO THEM, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS. TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG PARENTS, GUARDIANS AND PERSONS CARING FOR A PERSON WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, ADVICE AND INFORMATION FOR THOSE RESPONSIBLE FOR THEIR CARE. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE HEALTH OF THOSE CARING FOR PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING PRACTICAL ASSISTANCE AND SUPPORT AND SUCH OTHER SERVICES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DEEM NECESSARY WITH A VIEW TO MEETING THE EDUCATIONAL NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN AND IMPROVING THEIR LIVING CONDITIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
WSM Partners Ltd
133-137 Alexandra Road
LONDON
SW19 7JY
- Phone:
- 020 8545 7600
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window