UNITY IN DIVERSITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Unity in Diversity provides a welcome, friendship, informal advice, food and clothing support for asylum seekers and refugees in Swansea. Once a week, we deliver 3 English classes and a Drop-in meeting with a meal, access to a clothing bank and activity programme at York Place Baptist Church Swansea, SA1 3LZ. We manage weekly food deliveries and a second clothing bank at another Swansea location.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £7,137 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Swansea
Governance
- 25 May 2016: CIO registration
- UNITY IN DIVERSITY (SWANSEA 2015) (Previous name)
- UNITY IN DIVERSITY (SWANSEA2015) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADELLA PRITCHARD | Chair | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Plagne-Ismail | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hazle Boyles | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Achuil Monytoch | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Rev Eunjig Yang | Trustee | 05 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Jill Boggs | Trustee | 15 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.29k | £15.24k | £5.16k | £11.78k | £30.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.22k | £5.92k | £13.19k | £10.94k | £14.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £825 | £266 | £1.50k | £3.84k | £7.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 20 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 07 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 25 May 2016 as amended on 24 Nov 2023 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF ASYLUM SEEKERS AND THOSE OF GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
67 Gabalfa Road
Sketty
SWANSEA
SA2 8NA
- Phone:
- 01792 803102
- Email:
- unityswansea@gmail.com
- Website:
-
uidswansea.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window