BIDBOROUGH VILLAGE HALL - CIO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide the following community recreational, social, cultural and other events: These include Village School Nursery (currently running on 4 days a week), Mother and Toddler Group, Drama Society, Junior and Senior Badminton Club, WI, Rainbows, Brownies, Dog Training, Amateur Radio Club, Tai Chi. These meet on a daily/weekly basis. Also the hall is used for parties and other private events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

16 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 01 April 2016: CIO registration
- 07 February 2017: Funds received from 302683 VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM PARSONS | Chair | 12 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Ide | Trustee | 08 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Paul Hebditch | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Francis Cole | Trustee | 27 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Smith | Trustee | 10 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Priscilla Musker | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Graham Miller | Trustee | 11 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Wendy Weavis | Trustee | 20 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mike Harris | Trustee | 16 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Michael Lee | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JUDY LIDDALL | Trustee | 11 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mark Weavis | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WHEELER | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
QUENTIN STEVENS | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA HARRIS | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
SARAH SMITH | Trustee | 09 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.58k | £22.90k | £29.18k | £28.79k | £32.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.38k | £13.73k | £36.06k | £36.54k | £30.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £8.00k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 01 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE TO ESTABLISH AND RUN A VILLAGE HALL AND TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF BIDBOROUGH AND ITS IMMEDIATE VICINITY (?AREA OF BENEFIT?) WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Bidborough Ridge
Bidborough
TUNBRIDGE WELLS
TN4 0UP
- Phone:
- 01892514129
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window