Accounts and annual returns AL-FATIH-ULQUAREEB ISLAMIC SOCIETY OF UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 1170192
Charity reporting is up to date (33 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 05 March 2025 33 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 July 2024 176 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 May 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 May 2023 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 May 2023 835 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required