THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD REHOBOTH CENTRE BECKENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity carry out general charitable purposes and religious activities. Through regular religious meetings, prayers, bible studies and evangelism, we spread the love of Jesus among ourselves, local community and general mankind. Continuous support for local foodbank and also Bromley and Lewisham mindcare. Join forces with other local churches to spread the love of Christ among the people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bromley
Governance
- 25 January 2017: Standard registration
- RCCG INNER COURT (Working name)
- THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD INNER COURT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABRAHAM OLANREWAJU AKANDE | Chair | 04 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
OLAYINKA FUNMILOLA OJO | Trustee | 04 November 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.31k | £18.26k | £24.19k | £22.04k | £12.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.91k | £4.80k | £11.67k | £12.37k | £22.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 07 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 21 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 30 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 MAR 2016 as amended on 20 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE TRUST WHICH IS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH WORLDWIDE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DOCTRINES SET OUT IN THE STATEMENT OF FAITH CONTAINED IN THE SCHEDULE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 Ferndale Crescent
CARSHALTON
Surrey
SM5 2FG
- Phone:
- 07825502053
- Email:
- rccgrehobothcb@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window