DEEP ROOTS TALL TREES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Deep Roots Tall Trees (DRTT) is a Corby-based arts organisation that aims to extend the relevance of music, singing and the arts to the widest possible local and regional audience.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 September 2016: CIO registration
- DRTT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Diane Goldsmith | Trustee | 06 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Eddie James Arthey | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR John Gregory Mellor | Trustee | 23 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET MARGARET WATTS | Trustee | 14 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.82k | £57.18k | £48.08k | £80.10k | £82.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £81.12k | £41.27k | £85.46k | £94.47k | £83.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £1.81k | N/A | £1.58k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 25 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 30 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 26 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE ARTS AND CULTURE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROMOTING AND FACILITATING ACCESS TO AND PERFORMANCES OF MUSIC AND OTHER ART FORMS; AND 2. TO PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES IN NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO THEM IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 3. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION WITHIN THE FRAMEWORK OF THE ARTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Deep Roots Tall Trees
53 High Street
Corby
NN17 1UU
- Phone:
- 07838160686
- Email:
- info@deeprootstalltrees.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window