Financial history SKYANGELS AIR AMBULANCE

Charity number: 1168225
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 30/05/2023 30/05/2024
Total gross income £64.50k £66.00k £62.00k £52.45k £45.45k
Total expenditure £61.68k £65.00k £61.80k £51.56k £45.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A