SKYANGELS AIR AMBULANCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
SkyAngels Air Ambulance has been formed to provide the United Kingdoms with its first national air ambulance fixed-winged aircraft service. Our service will give the NHS an extra air ambulance option and bring us in-line with all other developed countries. Regional airline partnerships to help transfer patients by air with medical escorts. Funded & Flying on behalf of the general public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Brazil
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jersey
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- Norway
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wallis And Futuna
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 July 2016: CIO registration
- SKYANGELS INTERNATIONAL RESCUE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Trifler | Trustee | 09 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
WILL WHITTINGHAM | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ISABEL INFANTES | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2020 | 30/05/2021 | 30/05/2022 | 30/05/2023 | 30/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.50k | £66.00k | £62.00k | £52.45k | £45.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £61.68k | £65.00k | £61.80k | £51.56k | £45.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2024 | 31 March 2025 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2023 | 31 March 2025 | 366 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2023 | 31 March 2025 | 366 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2022 | 14 April 2023 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 May 2020 | 13 April 2021 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 14 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- (A) TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY OPERATING A FIXED-WING AIRCRAFT EMERGENCY MEDICAL TRANSFER SERVICE AND AIR / GROUND AMBULANCE TRANSFER SERVICE NATIONALLY IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY FOR REPATRIATION SERVICES; AND [B] SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS CONSISTENT WITH THE ABOVE OBJECT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. NOTHING IN THIS CONSTITUTION SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CIO FOR THE PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH [SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005] AND [SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008]
Area of benefit
IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND INTERNATIONALLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Klyne Aviation Centre
Hangar 2
Norwich International Airport
UNITED KINGDOM
NR6 6JT
- Phone:
- 0844 318 0999
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window