PAUSE CREATING SPACE FOR CHANGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pause works with women who have experienced, or are at risk of, repeat removals of children from their care. We aim to break this cycle and give women the opportunity to develop new skills and responses that can help them create a more positive future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,260,092
Donations and legacies | £1.86m | |
Charitable activities | £403.61k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£2,501,852
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.50m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,289,125 from 6 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.50m |
People

42 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 22 November 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Clemo | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Geeta Manglani | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Burridge | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Monica Imbert | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Frayer Lewis | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Roberts | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Grace Cheung | Trustee | 26 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Helen Causley | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lara Patel | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Peter Gilheany | Trustee | 21 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vicki Nash | Trustee | 10 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
PHILIPPA HILL | Trustee | 30 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.09m | £4.81m | £1.48m | £2.24m | £2.26m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.24m | £4.98m | £2.54m | £2.46m | £2.50m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.30m | £3.69m | N/A | £758.00k | £1.29m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.47m | £491.48k | £711.12k | £1.57m | £1.86m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £625.64k | £4.32m | £765.50k | £672.10k | £403.61k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.24m | £4.98m | £2.54m | £2.46m | £2.50m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.26k | £10.38k | £15.90k | £18.69k | £20.76k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.44m | £2.85m | £1.25m | £1.02m | £1.16m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £37.69k | £624.99k | £86.90k | £70.96k | £447.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 27 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27 NOV 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 DEC 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07 APR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 OCT 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 SEP 2018 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19 NOV 2018 as amended on 19 Nov 2018 as amended on 28 Nov 2019
Charitable objects
4.1 The Charity's objects ("Objects") are, for the public benefit: To prevent and relieve the suffering and hardship of children, and families in need, particularly but not exclusively in circumstances where a child is at risk of being removed from the parents’ care by order of the courts due to risk of significant harm. To do so in particular but not exclusively through supporting the provision of a therapeutic relationship with a skilled practitioner providing advice, counselling and intense support to those who have experienced, or are at risk of repeatedly having, their children taken into care and by facilitating constructive relationships with those within their system including partners, family and professionals.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Third Floor
87 Blackfriars Road
London
SE1 8HA
- Phone:
- 02030111949
- Email:
- info@pause.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window