SOPHIE'S JOURNEY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVIDE FREE HOLIDAYS TO CHILDREN WITH CANCER IN LINCOLNSHIRE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 12 July 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STACY SOUTHWELL | Trustee | 01 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
BEN ROBINSON | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BROADLEY | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW MARSHALL | Trustee | 10 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.07k | £40.79k | £62.52k | £67.85k | £74.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £40.07k | £24.75k | £46.49k | £47.80k | £45.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 14 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 12 Jul 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 18 IN LINCOLNSHIRE, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FREE HOLIDAY ACCOMMODATION, INFORMATION ADVICE AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Lurgan Close
LINCOLN
LN5 8SZ
- Phone:
- 07796458358
- Email:
- SOPHIESJOURNEY@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window