Trustees BURWOOD PRESCHOOL
Charity number: 1166835
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cathrine Vale | Trustee | 01 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Greig | Trustee | 11 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Bearman | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kate Pavier | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Kgale Glynn | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Booth | Trustee | 25 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MRS CLARE WARNE | Trustee | 29 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Hammatt | Trustee | 05 August 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.