LONDON WALTHAMSTOW CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We promote the advancement of the Christian faith via the activities of the local church. We do this by means of services held in that church and outreach to the community. We operate from 50 Church Hill, Walthamstow, London E17 9RY
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2022
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 19 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KAMINI BHANMATTEE PETERS | Chair | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dr Kenneth George Jeffery Baker | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE PATRICIA AKAR | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM VAUGHN | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
VALERIE VAUGHN | Trustee | 04 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EVERSLEY PETERS | Trustee | 21 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.50k | £66.09k | £54.63k | £52.00k | £44.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £51.92k | £64.56k | £55.29k | £59.80k | £68.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 253 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 April 2024 | 253 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2024 | 608 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 March 2024 | 608 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2024 | 969 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 March 2024 | 969 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2024 | 1343 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 03 April 2024 | 1343 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Association Registered 19 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AS PART OF THE CHURCH OF THE NAZARENE INC AND THE DISTRICT PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN NORTHERN ENGLAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
86 MACDONALD ROAD
LONDON
E17 4AZ
- Phone:
- 07974210939
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
londonnazarene.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window