NEW BRIGHTON GYMNASTICS PARENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides help and support to the New Brighton Gymnastics Club and their gymnasts. It will focus on gymnasts and children/young adults in the Wirral area who enjoy gymnastics. Funding is provided by local fund raising and donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Wirral
Governance
- 07 November 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Elizabeth Fitzpatrick | Trustee | 27 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Kirby | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
SUE CLEMENT-EVANS | Trustee | 07 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £875 | £0 | £11.18k | £786 | £6.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £4.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 December 2022 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 December 2022 | 31 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 March 2022 | 148 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2020 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 December 2020 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 07 Nov 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES TO PARTICIPATE IN GYMNASTICS AND OTHER RELATED SPORTS WHICH ARE CAPABLE OF PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS, IN PARTICULAR BY SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF NEW BRIGHTON SCHOOL OF GYMNASTICS.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 BROOKTHORPE CLOSE
WALLASEY
CH45 7SH
- Phone:
- 07801233110
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window