THE OXFORD ACADEMY ENDOWMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance education in accordance with principles of Church of England for benefit of the community served by the Oxford Academy; assisting/supporting education of pupils/ex-pupils of the school with provision of award/prize, bursaries, scholarships, equipment, grants for extra-curricular activities, provision of services/facilities at the School, fostering closer ties between the School & community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anthony Wilson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
MIKE O REGAN | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN BEECROFT | Trustee | 03 August 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 03 Aug 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY SERVED BY THE OXFORD ACADEMY OF OXFORD, IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA SERVED BY THE OXFORD ACADEMY AND IN PARTICULAR BY: (B) ASSISTING AND SUPPORTING THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE SCHOOL INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF AWARDS, PRIZES OR OTHER REWARDS; (C) RELIEVING THE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PUPILS AND EX-PUPILS OF THE SCHOOL BY THE PROVISION OF BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, EQUIPMENT OR IN ANY OTHER WAY THE TRUSTEE THINKS FIT TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION; (D) PROVIDING GRANTS OR OTHER FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO ASSIST PUPILS IN FINANCIAL NEED TO UNDERTAKE EXTRA-CURRICULAR ACTIVITIES (INCLUDING EDUCATIONAL TRAVEL IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR OVERSEAS); (E) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES OR FACILITIES AT THE SCHOOL NOT PROVIDED FOR UNDER THE FUNDING AGREEMENT; (F) FOSTERING CLOSER TIES BETWEEN THE SCHOOL AND COMMUNITY, INCLUDING PROMOTING EDUCATION IN THE COMMUNITY SERVED BY THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHURCH HOUSE OXFORD
LANGFORD LOCKS
KIDLINGTON
OXFORD
OX5 1GF
- Phone:
- 020 7222 5381
- Email:
- Howard.Dellar@lbmw.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window