Financial history THE LOUIS ROSS FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1168723
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/06/2020 01/06/2021 01/06/2022 01/06/2023 01/06/2024
Total gross income £26.51k £25.22k £47.70k £29.85k £18.35k
Total expenditure £19.15k £25.95k £33.17k £36.61k £26.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A