WORKING FUNDS HELD IN CONNECTION WITH THE GENUINE ORTHODOX CHRISTIANS (G O C ) IN BIRMINGHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
a) To preserve and spread the Orthodox Christian Faith and the Traditions of the Church as prescribed in the Holy Bible. b) To administer the spiritual and sacramental services to the faithful, members of the church of G.O.C. c) To spread the word of God to all people and provide both spiritual and material help for those in need. d) To train future clergymen. e) Provide spiritual education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
- Enfield
- Canada
- Chile
- United States
Governance
- 24 August 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Eleftheriou | Trustee | 11 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
TONY ERMOYENOUS | Trustee | 04 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
KYRIAKOS JOANNOU | Trustee | 04 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
XENOPHON JOANNOU | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.75k | £50.77k | £45.46k | £89.01k | £58.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.00k | £100.60k | £41.85k | £77.30k | £45.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 April 2025 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
01 April 2025 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 June 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 July 2024 | 156 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 March 2023 | 37 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
NO WRITTEN TRUST.
Charitable objects
RELIGIOUS PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holy Metropolis of Mercia
Station Road
Erdington
Birmingham
West Midlands
B23 6UB
- Phone:
- 07554816861
- Email:
- bishop.sozomenos@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window