Financial history REIGN IN CHRIST JESUS MINISTRY

Charity number: 1169030
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.75k £25.51k £8.75k £9.05k £9.82k
Total expenditure £8.36k £2.35k £4.86k £8.68k £11.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A