Financial history YORKSHIRE COAST FAMILIES

Charity number: 1167417
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 06/04/2020 06/04/2021 06/04/2022 06/04/2023 06/04/2024
Total gross income £9.46k £1.21k £3.66k £2.71k £10.52k
Total expenditure £3.73k £613 £5.49k £9.26k £10.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A