THE SECCHI DISK FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the conservation of the marine environment worldwide for the public benefit by engaging the public in scientific study and to facilitate research of marine plankton and the food chain in order to advance collective knowledge and understanding of the marine ecosystem and to maintain biodiversity for the public good.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 September 2016: CIO registration
- SDF (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PROF PAUL JB HART | Chair | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAUL HOUSEGO MA LLB | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WATES MBE | Trustee | 28 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2020 | 04/04/2021 | 04/04/2022 | 04/04/2023 | 04/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.40k | £2.12k | £7.07k | £57 | £3.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.50k | £1.23k | £2.48k | £6.42k | £2.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2024 | 08 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2023 | 21 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2022 | 28 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2021 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2021 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 April 2020 | 19 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 28 Sep 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE CONSERVATION OF THE MARINE ENVIRONMENT WORLDWIDE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY ENGAGING THE PUBLIC IN SCIENTIFIC STUDY AND TO FACILITATE RESEARCH OF MARINE PLANKTON AND THE FOOD CHAIN IN ORDER TO ADVANCE COLLECTIVE KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE MARINE ECOSYSTEM AND TO MAINTAIN BIODIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC GOOD.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kiln Cottage
Gnaton
Yealmpton
PLYMOUTH
PL8 2HU
- Phone:
- 01752 881529
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window