Financial history GLOBAL SKILLS CENTRE

Charity number: 1170010
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/04/2020 28/04/2021 28/04/2022 28/04/2023 28/04/2024
Total gross income £108.42k £149.33k £101.12k £119.22k £25.12k
Total expenditure £132.92k £95.81k £120.12k £110.39k £73.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £72.69k £24.95k £8.70k £8.70k £24.29k