PORTSKEWETT AND SUDBROOK PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATION HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Letting of hall for community use
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 11 July 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Cochrane | Chair | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Wilsher | Trustee | 15 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Grannell | Trustee | 10 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Helen Steel | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Elliott | Trustee | 21 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Dymock | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Nurcombe | Trustee | 28 June 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.56k | £12.76k | £8.77k | £11.34k | £18.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.44k | £9.71k | £5.64k | £10.66k | £21.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £162 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £30 | £3.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 24 APRIL 1978 AS AMENDED BY ORDER 1 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
TO HOLD IN TRUST FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE AND PLAYING FIELDS AND RECREATION GROUND FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE COMMUNITY OF PORTSKEWETT IN THE COUNTY OF GWENT AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEIR VISITORS FRIENDS AND INVITEES WITHOUST DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES - GAMES OF FOOTBALL AND OTHER SPORTS, ATHLECTICS AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
COMMUNITY OF PORTSKEWETT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manor Way
Portskewett
NP26 5TQ
- Phone:
- 01291420678
- Email:
- info_psrechall@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window