WYCHAVON FESTIVAL OF BRASS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion and delivery of an annual national brass band entertainment contest. Mentoring in conjunction with Worcestershire Youth Music the encouragement and development of children and young people in brass band music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
Total income includes £4,500 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 09 June 2016: CIO registration
- 20 July 2018: Funds received from 1099212 WYCHAVON FESTIVAL OF BRASS
- WFB (Working name)
- WYCHAVON FESTIVAL OF BRASS 2016 (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr VALERIE TRIM | Chair | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
David Edward Bolton | Trustee | 12 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Iain Gregory Willis | Trustee | 01 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Oliver John Goodall Wilson | Trustee | 29 January 2017 |
|
|||||
DIANA RAPHAEL | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHARLES DOWDESWELL | Trustee | 26 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.14k | £17.00k | £16.70k | £11.70k | £30.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.30k | £20.00k | £10.04k | £12.74k | £23.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 01 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 09 Jun 2016
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BRASS BAND MUSIC. 2. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MUSICIANS, ARRANGERS AND COMPOSERS IN BRASS BAND MUSIC. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN ALL ASPECTS OF BRASS BAND MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
55 Seymour Road
Alcester
B49 6LD
- Phone:
- 07780665558
- Email:
- trimvalerie@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window