GFS COMMUNITY ENTERPRISE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE COMPANY OWNS AND MANAGES THE OLD FIRE STATION GIPTON WHICH IS HOME TO A NUMBER OF PRIMARILY THIRD SECTOR TENANTS INCLUDING CHARITIES AND SOCIAL ENTERPRISES. IN ADDITION, THERE IS A COMMUNITY CAFE OPEN FOR TENANTS, VISITORS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC AND A RANGE OF MEETING ROOMS AVAILABLE FOR HIRE BY THE LOCAL COMMUNITY, CHARITIES AND BUSINESSES ON A GRADED HIRE RATE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,966 from 4 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
42 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 03 October 2016: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Jones | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Flattery | Trustee | 03 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Simpson | Trustee | 22 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter James Atkinson | Trustee | 01 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane South | Trustee | 27 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Howard Metcalf | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Goff | Trustee | 16 July 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.98k | £205.85k | £243.08k | £252.93k | £280.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £261.81k | £231.85k | £291.18k | £292.12k | £352.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £4.64k | £33.91k | £14.97k | £40.00k | £3.97k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 03 MAR 2016 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 AUG 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13 SEP 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO SUCH PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE GIPTON AREA OF LEEDS) AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE, INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO): 3.1 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT; 3.2 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE, AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE; 3.3 THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP: 3.3.1 IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR 3.3.2 TO EXISTING BUSINESSES; 3.4 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES; 3.5 PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES AND THE EFFECTIVE USE OF CHARITABLE RESOURCES; AND 3.6 PROMOTION OF THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR BY PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O Saffery LLP
10 Wellington Place
LEEDS
LS1 4AP
- Phone:
- 01132422426
- Email:
- info@leedscf.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window