BRITISH BOER GOAT SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO REGISTER AND MAINTAIN THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE BRITISH BOER GOAT BREED AND PROMOTE THE BREED TO FARMERS AND THE WIDER POPULATION. THE CHARITY IS ALSO INVOLVED IN THE PROMOTION OF THE BRITISH BOER GOAT THROUGH SHOWING AND KNOWLEDGE SHARING EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 16 August 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOANNE JENKINS | Chair | 06 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Wright | Trustee | 05 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Paul Simon Unwin | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marie Smith | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hayley Pegram | Trustee | 14 March 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.90k | £34.79k | £30.49k | £19.48k | £15.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.17k | £17.15k | £20.65k | £14.93k | £21.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 May 2024 | 109 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 February 2023 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION REGISTERED 16 AUG 2016 AMENDED ON 16 MAR 2017 AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AGRICULTURE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT, PROMOTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE BRITISH BOER GOAT AND ENCOURAGING THE BREEDING OF BRITISH BOER GOATS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Bell Yard
London
WC2A 2JR
- Phone:
- 01280 817294
- Email:
- bbgs.secretary@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window