HARRYSHOLIDAYHANGOUT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
we help families with children who have had or got cancer by providing a free break away in our caravan in blackpool
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 April 2016: CIO registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrea melarkey | Trustee | 08 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
peter melarkey | Trustee | 08 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPHINE MCCARTHY | Trustee | 16 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
DARREN GRIFFIN | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROL BROWN | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.40k | £477 | £4.24k | £225 | £258 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.25k | £7.73k | £1.22k | £5.00k | £11 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 327 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 21 February 2025 | 327 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2024 | 369 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 03 April 2024 | 369 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 03 April 2023 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 April 2023 | 368 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 13 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE:- THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY OFFERING TO CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE TO THE AGE OF 19 YEARS WHO ARE DIAGNOSED WITH, OR RECOVERING FROM, OR CONVALESCING FROM CANCER TREATMENT, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, RESPITE HOLIDAYS TO ASSIST AND AID THEIR RECOVERY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
162 Longford Road West
STOCKPORT
Cheshire
SK5 6HY
- Phone:
- 01612211516
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window