THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FARLEIGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Parish of Farleigh consists of four Churches. All Daint's Dummer, St Andrew's Farleigh Wallop, St Leonard's Cliddesden and St Martin's Ellisfield. The churches are open to all for worship. We also have the Clifton Room available at Dummer for church activities. Messy Church and a Play Group is run at Cliddesden Village Hall . Contact any trustee for details.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
51 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 04 May 2016: Previously excepted registration
- THE PARISH OF FARLEIGH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hannah Jessica Houstin-Lacey | Chair | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
PETER CHRISTOPHER WALLACE RAINE | Trustee | 26 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lord Oliver Lymington | Trustee | 30 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Charles Anthony Palmer-Tomkinson | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
BEVERLEY ANNE GUINESS | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE SCHOLEY | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
EAMONN JOHN HARDING FINSTP | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
LYNDA JANE HARDY | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD CAZENOVE TD | Trustee | 27 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £132.39k | £122.55k | £112.86k | £139.87k | £87.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £210.30k | £125.32k | £109.82k | £126.25k | £105.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 21 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 01 JAN 2008
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fair Holme
Green Lane
Ellisfield
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG25 2QL
- Phone:
- 01256381279
- Email:
- Bernard@brocaz.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window