BURTON GREEN VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure time occupation with the objectives of improving the conditions of life for the residents of Burton Green Parish and the neighbourhood. To establish a community centre and to manage such a centre in line with the above objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Coventry City
- Solihull
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
- 13 July 2020: Funds received from 522898 BURTON GREEN VILLAGE HALL
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHERYL JOY WALL | Chair | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL STEVEN SMITH | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Derek Lawrence | Trustee | 02 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Knight | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dianne Adams | Trustee | 22 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Deeley | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEIRDRE VERNON | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Susan Line | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
ADRIAN PHILIP HICKINBOTTOM | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.23k | £23.45k | £9.10k | £21.78k | £45.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.95k | £9.35k | £9.26k | £14.79k | £89.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 31 July 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 02 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF BURTON GREEN PARISH AND NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE RESIDENTS. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER: TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN OR MANAGE OR CO-OPERATE WITH ANY STATUTORY AUTHORITY IN THE MAINTENANCE OF SUCH A CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Burton Green Village Hall
Red Lane
Burton Green
KENILWORTH
Warwickshire
CV8 1PF
- Phone:
- 000000000000
- Email:
- bgvhbookings@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window