CHURCHILL AND BLAKEDOWN SPORTS AND RECREATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Churchill and Blakedown Sports and Recreation Centre. At the centre we provide sports and recreational facilities for the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 10 August 1978: Standard registration
- CHURCHILL AND BLAKEDOWN SPORTS CENTRE (Working name)
- CHURCHILL AND BLAKEDOWN RECREATION CENTRE (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
philip foster | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
David James Wood | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
IAN ROBERT CHALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.91k | £60.04k | £15.58k | £40.71k | £82.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.18k | £44.26k | £29.37k | £47.04k | £79.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.43k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 21 JULY 1971
Charitable objects
FOR THE PURPOSES OF A RECREATION GROUND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
BLAKEDOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Forge Lane
Blakedown
Kidderminster
DY10 3JF
- Phone:
- 01562700900
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window