THE SHILOH PENTECOSTAL FELLOWSHIP TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Weekly befriending coffee sessions for multicultual communities especially the isolated; setting up of a community info point. Weekly children & youths activities including, group discussions, games, setting up of community library. Educational trips and half term music workshop. Community Visitations. Evangelistic outreach. Advice and counselling. Donations to individuals and charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 09 October 1978: Standard registration
- SHILOH PENTECOSTAL FELLOWSHIP (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Wayne Findlay | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Aurelia Daniela Dodoc | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olabisi Barnes | Trustee | 14 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
REV G SEMPER | Trustee | 12 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.08k | £5.67k | £8.82k | £15.00k | £5.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.72k | £4.53k | £6.84k | £11.00k | £4.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 March 2024 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 APRIL 1978
Charitable objects
THE FURTHERANCE OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGH THE SPREAD OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE FURTHERANCE OF EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Shiloh Pentecostal Fellowship Church
Ninian Park Road Riverside
CARDIFF
CARDIFF
CF11 6JA
- Phone:
- 02929340132
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window