AT A LOSS.ORG

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Signposting bereaved people in the UK to relevant and up to date support services, information and resources via our national website. Training and resourcing professionals to support bereaved adults and young people, including churches, to provide community support. Collaborating with others to improve accessibility to bereavement support across the UK and understanding of the impact of loss
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
26 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 September 2016: CIO registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Patrick Normand | Chair | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Keith Lawson Brown | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
LUKE WILLIAM RICHMOND | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROL JANE OUNDJIAN | Trustee | 02 August 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.34k | £131.76k | £121.40k | £121.40k | £195.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.42k | £86.06k | £122.30k | £122.30k | £176.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £15.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION Registered 19 Sep 2016 as amended on 25 Sep 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE, WHOLLY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND:- 4.1 THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH BY, NOT LIMITED TO, RELIEVING THE MENTAL, EMOTIONAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM BEREAVEMENT, SIGNIFICANT LOSS OR FAMILY BREAKDOWN; AND 4.2 TO EDUCATE AND RAISE AWARENESS ON MATTERS OF BEREAVEMENT, SIGNIFICANT LOSS AND FAMILY BREAKDOWN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
AtaLoss.org
PO. Box 824
Chichester
PO19 9WW
- Phone:
- 07801351947
- Email:
- office@ataloss.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window