MK CAT RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue stray and feral cats, giving them the vet care they need, then re-homing or re-locating them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bedford
- Buckinghamshire
- Milton Keynes
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 26 April 2016: Standard registration
- MKCR (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stuart Gary Ball | Trustee | 02 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Warren | Trustee | 27 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mandy Ann Fell Ms | Trustee | 04 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS CAROLE ANNE SANDRA HALLETT | Trustee | 13 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/05/2020 | 01/05/2021 | 01/05/2022 | 01/05/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.78k | £37.75k | £35.63k | £29.29k | £23.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.52k | £28.86k | £21.89k | £22.04k | £29.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 25 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 May 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2023 | 30 April 2024 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2022 | 01 April 2024 | 397 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2022 | 01 April 2024 | 397 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2021 | 15 February 2023 | 351 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 May 2021 | 15 February 2023 | 351 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 May 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
01 May 2020
(These accounts |
05 March 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 APR 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS CATS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR CATS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO CAT WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG CATS
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Elmers Park
Bletchley
MILTON KEYNES
MK3 6DJ
- Phone:
- 07741510799
- Email:
- mkcatrescue@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window