THE GALLAGHER TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gallagher Trust funds and manages a Community Based Living Programme with the Ubumwe Community Centre in Rwanda to provides homes, full time care, love, education, recreation,sport, skills training and medical support to vulnerable and orphaned young people with mental and physical disabiliites who were abandoned when The Noel Orphanage where they were living closed in December 2014.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Rwanda
Governance
- 05 April 2016: CIO registration
- TGT (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON GALLAGHER | Chair | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
STEVEN DENNIS GALLAGHER | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor PANAYOTIS VOSTANIS | Trustee | 05 April 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.37k | £89.77k | £17.69k | £4.49k | £1.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £109.00k | £101.15k | £59.40k | £7.41k | £1.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 02 April 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 23 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 27 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 May 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 May 2019
(These accounts |
17 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - Foundation Registered 05 Apr 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND OTHERS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND PHYSICAL AND / OR MENTAL DISABILITIES PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN RWANDA BY PROVISION OF HOUSING, FULL TIME CARERS, FOOD, CLOTHING AND MEDICAL SUPPORT. IN ADDITION, TO SUPPORT UBUMWE COMMUNITY CENTRE TO PROVIDE DAILY RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, SKILLS TRAINING AND SPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
LAVENDER HOUSE
MELTON LANE
SUTTON BONINGTON
LE12 5RQ
- Phone:
- 07966180882
- Email:
- info@thegallaghertrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window