Financial history GURU NANAK GURDWARA

Charity Number: 507811
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £579.80k £176.68k £565.26k £707.05k £745.70k
Total expenditure £297.85k £163.46k £287.64k £487.70k £577.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.20k £10.04k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £530.32k N/A £556.84k £696.15k £729.46k
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.25k N/A £8.42k £7.20k £16.23k
Income - Other £1.20k N/A £0 £3.69k £0
Income - Legacies £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £295.86k N/A £37.12k £451.95k £505.06k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 N/A £0 £35.75k £39.55k
Expenditure - Governance £1.85k N/A £1.62k £1.85k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £9.13k £19.20k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A £0 £22.74k £0
Expenditure - Other £1.99k N/A £250.53k £0 £32.72k