KIRKBURTON AND HIGHBURTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Kirkburton and Highburton and the neighbourhood without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions by associating the local authorities, voluntary organisations and inhabitants in a common effort to advance education and to provide facilities in the interests of social welfare for recreation and leisure-time occupation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 02 August 1978: Standard registration
- BURTON VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- K AND H C A (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Taylor | Trustee | 08 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Blunt | Trustee | 13 November 2014 |
|
|||||
PETER DENNIS WHITE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GEORGINA ANN DICKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £30.49k | £36.08k | £30.81k | £24.27k | £32.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.55k | £14.53k | £35.40k | £29.11k | £34.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.25k | £21.57k | £2.95k | £1.30k | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 20 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 27 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 1978
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF KIRKBURTON AND HIGHBURTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHE OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS, (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
KIRKBURTON AND HIGHBURTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kirkburton & Highburton Comm Assoc
Burton Village Hall
Northfield Lane
Kirkburton
HUDDERSFIELD
HD8 0QT
- Phone:
- 01484605160
- Email:
- treasurer@khca.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window