Financial history CHRISTINE'S HOUSING SUPPORT CHARITY

Charity Number: 1169029
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.26k £31.02k £31.22k £35.25k £43.70k
Total expenditure £32.86k £21.20k £33.19k £24.85k £43.43k
Income from government contracts N/A £24.49k £25.64k N/A £42.12k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A