HUDDERSFIELD ASTRONOMICAL AND PHILOSOPHICAL SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the science and hobby of Astronomy and related subjects. To educate the public in these subjects. This is done by regular talks, meetings in our clubroom, astronomy courses and outreach to others.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kirklees
Governance
- 02 August 1978: Standard registration
- 18 February 2021: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 18 February 2021: Funds transferred to 1178943 HUDDERSFIELD ASTRONOMY SOCIETY
- H A P S (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.13k | £5.91k | £5.45k | £3.95k | £1.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.35k | £6.54k | £5.10k | £6.94k | £23.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 15 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 30 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 November 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED 19 DECEMBER 1977 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUN 2016
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE SCIENCE OF ASTRONOMY AND ALL BRANCHES OF SCIENTIFIC RESEARCH AND IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE BUT NOT OTHERWISE: (A) TO ENCOURAGE A POPULAR INTEREST IN ASTRONOMY; (B) TO CIRCULATE CURRENT ASTRONOMICAL INFORMATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED - IN PRACTICE HUDDERSFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window