MERSEYSIDE & CHESHIRE BLOOD BIKES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To help relieve sickness by the provision of motorcycle and vehicles courier services to hospitals and hospices in the charities catchment areas all free of charge and by volunteers of the group
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wirral
Governance
- 19 July 2016: Standard registration
- 02 January 2024: Funds received from 213990 THE LONSDALE TRUST WALLASEY
- NW BLOOD BIKES MERSEYSIDE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Roberts | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mark Anthony Denton | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michael Holmes | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
MR N CORKE | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £129.36k | £53.48k | £69.97k | £30.42k | £63.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £50.96k | £61.33k | £55.60k | £43.00k | £50.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 23 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 11 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01 JAN 2016 as amended on 20 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PROTECT HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF TRANSPORT OF URGENTLY NEEDED BLOOD, DRUGS, HUMAN TISSUES AND OTHER MEDICAL REQUIREMENTS BETWEEN HOSPITALS AND BLOOD TRANSFUSION BANKS PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE MERSEYSIDE & CHESHIRE REGIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 South Mossley Hill Road
LIVERPOOL
L19 3PY
- Phone:
- 0843 289 1999
- Email:
- trustees@mcbloodbikes.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window