Trustees THE PALAEONTOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1168330

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Michael James Benton OBE FRS | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Barry Harvey Lomax | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Martin Ross Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Professor Philip Conrad James Donoghue FRS | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nidia Alvarez-Armada | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Richard Peter Dearden | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Neil Keating | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laura Beatriz Porro | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Prof. Daniela Natalie Schmidt | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Orla Grace Bath Enright | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Robert Stephen Sansom | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Harriet Bethany Drage | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth May Dowding | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Richard Tozer Spencer | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Susannah Catherine Rose Lanaway | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Manabu Sakamoto | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Russell James Garwood | Trustee | 01 January 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.